Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Robert P. Astorino , Individually, And In His Capacity As Westchester County Executive, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Halpern, Philip M, Hochberg, Shari B., Nicolay, Harry Joseph, against Basil Seggos In His Official Capacity, Entergy Nuclear Indian Point 2, Llc, Entergy Nuclear Indian Point 3, Llc, Entergy Nuclear Operations, Inc., Governor Andrew M. Cuomo In His Official Capacity, (total of 16) See All represented by Desai, Mihir Ashok, Graham, John Calvin, Ommen, Todd Douglas, Sipos, John Joseph, Tallent, Joshua Michael, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with Helen M Blackwood presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHelen M Blackwood Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 09, 2017 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
|
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
|
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time191 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: June 09, 2017NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001)
Date: May 09, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: June 16, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
November 01, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE | |
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Hon Blackwood att. Stipulation re: Briefing Schedule |
|
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE Stipulation re: Briefing Schedule |
|
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - INTERIM | |
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER (Motion #001) | |
July 14, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #002) | |
July 14, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002) | |
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #003) Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Change Venue and to Stay Proceedings of Respondent N |
|
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #002) Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Change Venue |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.