Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Margaret M. Schneider, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Halpern, Philip M, Hochberg, Shari B., against Marjorie M. Fuscone, Richard Fuscone, represented by Steiner, Scott J, in the jurisdiction of Westchester County. This case was filed in Westchester County Superior Courts Westchester County Supreme Court with Terry Jane Ruderman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry Jane Ruderman Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 16, 2017 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions210 days |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseWestchester County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time223 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: September 27, 2017SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: August 08, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: March 13, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on September 27, 2017 | |
September 14, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | |
March 16, 2017 | Hearing |
Judgment Granted
Judge: Ruderman, Hon. Terry Jane |
|
March 16, 2017 | Docket Event | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: OTHER Order and Stipulation to be So-Ordered |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Judgment |
|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.