Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Us Bank N A As Trustee For Gsaa Home Equity Trust 2006-5 Asset Backed Certificates, Series 2006-5, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Amy Salerno, Brian Salerno, Estate Of Robert M Salerno, Janet Smith, John Doe, (total of 15) See All in the jurisdiction of Westchester County, NY, . Westchester County, NY Superior Courts with Joan B Lefkowitz presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoan B Lefkowitz Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 28, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWestchester County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 10, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 28, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 25, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 17, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
November 17, 2022 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
October 04, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service |
||
September 29, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #9) Attorney Affirmation in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Confirming Referee Report and Jud Attorney Affirmation in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Confirming Referee Report and Jud ... show more |
||
September 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #9) Certificate of Merit |
||
September 29, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION Westchester Law Journal |
||
September 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #9) Department of Defense Search results |
||
September 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #9) Notice of Default |
||
September 29, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #9) Assignments |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.