Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lynn Ann Elliott, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Williams, Roberta G., against Dee Jay Elliott, represented by Setser, Thomas P., in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, NY, . Wayne County, NY Superior Courts with Richard Healy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard Healy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWayne County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
February 13, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
February 13, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
February 07, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
January 19, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED | ||
January 18, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - A | ||
January 18, 2023 | SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION | ||
January 18, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
January 18, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
July 13, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.