Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Julie L Delyser, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Warner, Stephen Robert, against Jared M Delyser, represented by Brenizer, Jon W., in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, NY, . Wayne County, NY Superior Courts with Daniel Barrett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel Barrett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWayne County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
October 17, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 11, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 08, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
June 09, 2022 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
March 28, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
March 24, 2022 | ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
March 24, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
March 18, 2022 | SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
March 14, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.