Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
In Trepid 709 Llc, In-Trepid709 Llc, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Gol Section 5-1701 Et Seq) case against Jamie Gilmore, New York Life Insurance And Annuity Corporation, New York Life Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, NY, . Wayne County, NY Superior Courts with Daniel Barrett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel Barrett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 05, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Gol Section 5-1701 Et Seq) |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWayne County, NY |
|
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: July 07, 2022JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: August 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) ORDER APPROVING TRANSFER TO STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS |
||
August 18, 2022 |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Order Approving Transfer |
||
August 17, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Supplemental Affidavit of Jamie Gilmore |
||
August 17, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affirmation of Service |
||
July 12, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of Service |
||
July 07, 2022 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED | ||
July 05, 2022 | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
July 05, 2022 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Order to Show Cause |
||
July 05, 2022 |
PETITION Verified Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.