Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Gina Carrano, Thomas Carrano, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Kessler, Steven Leigh, against American Society For The Prevention Of Cruelty To Animals, Chautauqua County Humane Society, Cracker Box Palace Inc, Humane Society Of Rochester And Monroe County For The Prevention Of Cruelty To Animals Inc, Lollypop Farm, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, NY, . Wayne County, NY Superior Courts with Richard Healy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard Healy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Destruction Of Property) |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWayne County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 01, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 25, 2023NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (PRE RJI)
Date: March 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 25, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Notice to Admit |
||
September 18, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
September 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B September 14, 2023 Letter |
||
July 21, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
July 21, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
July 21, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
July 21, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
June 27, 2023 | STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.