Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Citizens Bank Na, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Flynn, Kerri S, Flynn, Kristine D., Sheerin, John J, against Michael H Lane, in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, NY, . Wayne County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 27, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWayne County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 27, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 27, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2021 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) *Corrected* NOTICE DISCONTINUING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE |
||
October 19, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
June 21, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
June 07, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 27, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
May 27, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.