Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Masetta Russell, S&R And Son, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shur, Joseph M, against Mark Natalie, represented by Jong, Tracy, Lembke, Matthew Robert, in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, NY, . Wayne County, NY Superior Courts with Richard Healy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard Healy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWayne County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 06, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2023 | TRIAL / HEARING MINUTES | ||
June 01, 2023 | ORDER - MEDIATION | ||
May 17, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) | ||
May 15, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Appearance of Counsel for Defendant Natalie |
||
May 10, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS | ||
May 10, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
January 05, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) | ||
February 05, 2021 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | ||
February 03, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
January 27, 2021 | Affidavit of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.