Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, NY, . Wayne County, NY Superior Courts with HON.JOHN B.NESBITT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON.JOHN B.NESBITT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2018 |
CategoryRes. Foreclosure Conf Eligible |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWayne County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time461 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2018 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) ESBITT (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
May 22, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) ESBITT (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
May 22, 2018 | Hearing |
PRE-DISCONTINUED ESBITT (Court Activity) Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
April 02, 2018 | Motion |
DISCONTINUE ACTION (Motion #001) Decided: 05/22/2018GRANTED Before Justice: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT Answer demanded: No Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
April 02, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) ESBITT (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
January 09, 2018 | Hearing |
ESBITT (Settlement Conference)
Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
January 09, 2018 | Hearing |
HEARING HELD ESBITT (Hearing) Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
October 11, 2017 | Hearing |
ESBITT (Settlement Conference)
Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
October 11, 2017 | Hearing |
HEARING HELD ESBITT (Hearing) Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
September 19, 2017 | Hearing |
ESBITT (Settlement Conference)
Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.