Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, NY, . Wayne County, NY Superior Courts with HON.JOHN B.NESBITT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON.JOHN B.NESBITT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2017 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWayne County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time86 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-DISCONTINUED ESBITT (Court Activity) Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
February 28, 2017 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) ESBITT (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
February 28, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) ESBITT (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
January 24, 2017 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) ESBITT (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
December 05, 2016 | Motion |
OSC/VACATE JUDGMENT (Motion #001) Decided: 02/28/2017WITHDRAWN Before Justice: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT Answer demanded: No Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
December 05, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) ESBITT (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.