Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, NY, . Wayne County, NY Superior Courts with John B. Nesbitt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn B. Nesbitt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 16, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 09, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationWayne County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time330 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-DISCONTINUED ESBITT (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
March 01, 2017 | Hearing |
HEARING HELD ESBITT (Hearing) Held Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
March 01, 2017 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ESBITT (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
February 15, 2017 | Hearing |
HEARING HELD ESBITT (Hearing) Held Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
February 15, 2017 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ESBITT (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
January 30, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-NOTE POST JUDGEMENT APPLICATION ESBITT (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
December 27, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-DECIDED ESBITT (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
December 27, 2016 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) ESBITT (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
December 27, 2016 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) ESBITT (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
December 27, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) ESBITT (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.