Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Other case in the jurisdiction of Wayne County, NY, . Wayne County, NY Superior Courts with HON.JOHN B.NESBITT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON.JOHN B.NESBITT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2016 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationWayne County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time215 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2016 | Hearing |
POST-TRANSFER TO ARBITRATION ESBITT (Court Activity) Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
April 20, 2016 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE FILED ESBITT (Court Activity) Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
March 28, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) ESBITT (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
February 16, 2016 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) ESBITT (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
January 07, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) ESBITT (Motion Part) Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
|
January 07, 2016 | Motion |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #001) Decided: 03/28/2016DENIED Before Justice: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT Answer demanded: No Judge: HON.JOHN B.NESBITT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.