Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jamie D. Bovair, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Matte, Jeffrey Carlson, against Garrett L. Bovair, represented by Judd, Karen Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Kelly S Mckeighan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKelly S Mckeighan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2022 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2023 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
January 11, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 11, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
October 13, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
October 13, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
September 27, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE | ||
September 23, 2022 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | ||
September 23, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 23, 2022 | RETAINER AGREEMENT | ||
September 23, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.