Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Credit Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Poulin, Anthony Scott, against Jonathan Perkins, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJuly 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 31, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 31, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2022 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
December 29, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
November 23, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT CORRESPONDENCE |
||
September 27, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFF OF MAILING/ADDITIONAL NOTICE |
||
September 21, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 31, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
August 31, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.