Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Alexus Morgan Melanson, Alexus Morgan Melanson A Minor Child, By Malinda J Bell Her Parent, Malinda J Bell, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case represented by Martin, Trinidad Martinez, against Alexus Morgan Bell, For Leave To Assume Another Name, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Robert J Muller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert J Muller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Name Change |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeName Change |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION | ||
April 05, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
April 05, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Order granting infant name change |
||
March 17, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 17, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
March 04, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
October 21, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
August 27, 2021 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
August 27, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 26, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.