Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
In The Matter Of The Application Of Carissa Estates Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case against The Assessor Of The Town Of White Creek, The Town Of White Creek, represented by Wrigley, D Alan, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Kathleen B. Hogan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathleen B. Hogan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
PETITION
Date: July 28, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 19, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: December 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2022 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Stipulation of Settlement |
||
January 19, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
January 19, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 27, 2021 | STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
December 27, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 05, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 05, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 16, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
August 23, 2021 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Letter from Court scheduling Conference |
||
August 08, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.