Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, against Thomas P Quarters, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 28, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: September 13, 2021ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: September 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 13, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
September 10, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
September 10, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted |
||
September 10, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION STATUE OF LIMITATIONS AFFIRMATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUE OF LIMITATIONS AFFIRMATION Redacted |
||
September 10, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR JUDGMENT Redacted |
||
September 10, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
March 02, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFF OF MAILING / 2ND NOTICE LETTER |
||
February 17, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 17, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.