Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bayview Loan Servicing, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fusco, Emma Louise, Gazzo, Nicole Carol, Pascuzzi, Ashley Marie, against Chad S. Clark, John Doe, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 05, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 15, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHAD S. CLARK AOS |
||
December 14, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHAD S. CLARK AOM |
||
December 14, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CHAD S. CLARK 3215 |
||
December 03, 2020 |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
November 02, 2020 |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
October 15, 2020 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING E-Filing Authorization |
||
October 15, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service-JOHN DOE |
||
October 05, 2020 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
October 05, 2020 |
CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
October 05, 2020 |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.