Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Scully, James Paul, against Dee Burch, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 14, 2020ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: November 20, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 14, 2020NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: November 19, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 22, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2020 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
November 19, 2020 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
October 22, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING/SECOND NOTICE LETTER |
||
October 14, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 14, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 21, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.