Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Icc 4 West Main, Llc, Innovative Concepts Consulting Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Seely, Patrick L, against Assessor Of The Town Of White Creek, Board Of Assessment Review Of The Town Of White Creek, Town Of White Creek, New York, represented by Williams Buettner, Karla Marie, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Martin D Auffredou presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMartin D Auffredou Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 14, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 18, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2020 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
October 14, 2020 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
October 05, 2020 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 23, 2020 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE request a Court conference |
||
August 04, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of NOA Cambridge CSD |
||
August 04, 2020 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance (Cambridge CSD) |
||
July 29, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) by Certified Mail on School District & County |
||
July 29, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Personal Service on Town |
||
July 23, 2020 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
July 21, 2020 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.