Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Granville Center For Rehabilitation And Nursing Dba, Ir Operations Associates Llc D B A Granville Center For Rehabilitation And Nursing, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Levine, Cari-Ann Robyn, against Carole Decosimo, Diane Marshall, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Robert J Muller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert J Muller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 14, 2020ANSWER
Date: August 12, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: September 24, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 27, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
December 27, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
September 27, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
June 01, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
March 22, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
March 22, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 05, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affirmation of Service of Motion for Summary Judgment |
||
February 25, 2021 | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) | ||
February 25, 2021 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.