Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stiller, Craig Scott, against A K A Laura L Kamburelis, Laura Kamburelis A K A Laura L Kamburelis, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 07, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 07, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 01, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
February 18, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
February 03, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION |
||
February 03, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
February 03, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR |
||
February 03, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF |
||
February 03, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 03, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR |
||
February 03, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF |
||
February 03, 2021 | JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.