Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Edward Cardinale, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Brennan, Joseph Robert, against Jennifer L Austin, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Constructive Trust/Breach) |
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeTrusts |
ANSWER
Date: July 23, 2020DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 18, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2020REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: July 27, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2020 | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
August 18, 2020 | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE | ||
July 27, 2020 | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | ||
July 23, 2020 | ANSWER | ||
July 21, 2020 | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE | ||
June 30, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.