Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Alison Ruth Cary, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Donahue, Elizabeth Ann, against Jeffrey Allen Cary, represented by Matte, Jeffrey Carlson, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Adam D Michelini presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAdam D Michelini Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 24, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2021 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
March 29, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 29, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
January 05, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 05, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 30, 2020 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
December 22, 2020 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) MICHELINI (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ADAM D. MICHELINI |
|
December 07, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 02, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
December 02, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.