Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Julie C Tripp, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Judd, Karen Lynn, against Ryan M Tripp, represented by Martin, Trinidad Martinez, Place, Rose Theresa, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Adam D Michelini presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAdam D Michelini Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 12, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2022 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
January 14, 2022 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
January 13, 2022 |
FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
January 13, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
January 11, 2022 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
January 11, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
December 15, 2021 | PART 130 CERTIFICATION | ||
December 15, 2021 | AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY | ||
December 15, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT IN LIEU OF TESTIMONY | ||
December 15, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.