Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Amy S. Bushong, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Fish, Nicole Catherine, against Joseph W. Bushong, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2021 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
June 18, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE BY MAIL |
||
June 18, 2020 | ANSWER | ||
June 18, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT DECLINATION |
||
June 17, 2020 | ANSWER | ||
June 17, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT DECLINATION OF CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC FILING |
||
June 03, 2020 | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE | ||
May 26, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.