Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Glen T. Bruening presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGlen T. Bruening Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management98 days |
Filing DateMay 26, 2020 |
||
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
||
ANSWER
Date: July 07, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 26, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2021 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE BRUENING (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. GLEN T. BRUENING |
|
September 01, 2020 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 01, 2020 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE BRUENING (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. GLEN T. BRUENING |
|
July 28, 2020 | NOTICE | ||
July 28, 2020 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
July 28, 2020 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Plaintiff's Verified Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR Plaintiff's Verified Bill of Particulars Redacted |
||
July 07, 2020 | Answer | ||
July 07, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 07, 2020 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
July 07, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Certificate of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.