Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Whalen Chevrolet, Inc., filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Emergency Application Tro) case represented by Spencer, Rhiannon Ineva, against D B A Unifirst Corporation Location 052, Unifirst Corporation D B A Unifirst Corporation Location 052, represented by Temes, David Clarke, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Martin D Auffredou presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMartin D Auffredou Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2020 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Emergency Application Tro) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time124 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 20, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 17, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: May 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2020 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
September 21, 2020 | Hearing |
PRE-SETTLED AUFFREDOU (Court Activity) Judge: HON. MARTIN D. AUFFREDOU |
|
September 21, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) AUFFREDOU (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MARTIN D. AUFFREDOU |
|
September 17, 2020 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) AUFFREDOU (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MARTIN D. AUFFREDOU |
|
August 20, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) AUFFREDOU (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MARTIN D. AUFFREDOU |
|
July 31, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) AUFFREDOU (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MARTIN D. AUFFREDOU |
|
July 21, 2020 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
July 20, 2020 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter request for court mediation |
||
July 17, 2020 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
July 10, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) AUFFREDOU (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MARTIN D. AUFFREDOU |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.