Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Glens Falls Hospital, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Donovan, Linda L, against Russell C Gosselin Jr, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Martin D Auffredou presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMartin D Auffredou Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions217 days |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 22, 2020ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 21, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2021 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
August 18, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
August 18, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 22, 2020 | JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION | ||
October 21, 2020 | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
October 21, 2020 | Hearing |
PRE-MOTION AUFFREDOU (Court Activity) Judge: HON. MARTIN D. AUFFREDOU |
|
October 21, 2020 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) AUFFREDOU (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MARTIN D. AUFFREDOU |
|
October 21, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) AUFFREDOU (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MARTIN D. AUFFREDOU |
|
September 22, 2020 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
September 21, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint and Affidavit of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.