Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates,Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Jordan, Tarah Eve, against Donald G Elliott, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 18, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions260 days |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 18, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: December 11, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 01, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2020 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 11, 2020 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
December 03, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
December 03, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
December 03, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
December 03, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT ORIG CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR ORIG CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
December 03, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
December 03, 2020 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
July 09, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFF OF MAILING/2ND NOTICE LETTER |
||
July 01, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.