Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Pca Acquisitions V Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Einstein, Stephen, against Frank A Carballo, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 17, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions188 days |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 17, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: December 09, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 17, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2020 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 09, 2020 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
September 21, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
September 21, 2020 | AFFIRMATION | ||
September 21, 2020 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SEA#363621 |
||
September 21, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 21, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT Executed OCA Affidavit of Orig Cred |
||
September 21, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT Executed OCA Affidavit of Debt Buyer |
||
June 23, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFF OF MAILING/2ND NOTICE LETTER |
||
June 15, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.