Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
In The Matter Of The Application Of U.S. Bank National Association And, Lyall A. Gorenstein Of The Lyall A. Gorenstein Irrevocable Trust No.2, Under Tru, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by O'Connell, Cecilia E., Toscano, Thomas A, against For An Order Cancelling Of Record A Satisfaction Of Mortgage Pursuant To New Yor, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Robert J Muller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert J Muller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Cancellation Of Instrumen) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Cycle Time77 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 04, 2020ORDER - CANCELLING AND DISCHARGING SATISFACTION OF MORTGAGE
Date: May 21, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 20, 2020PETITION
Date: March 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
May 29, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service |
||
May 29, 2020 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Notice of Entry of Order |
||
May 21, 2020 | ORDER - CANCELLING AND DISCHARGING SATISFACTION OF MORTGAGE | ||
May 20, 2020 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
May 20, 2020 | Hearing |
PRE-OTHER MULLER (Court Activity) Judge: HON. ROBERT J. MULLER |
|
May 20, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) MULLER (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT J. MULLER |
|
May 18, 2020 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) MULLER (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT J. MULLER |
|
April 06, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MULLER (Motion Part) Judge: HON. ROBERT J. MULLER |
|
March 04, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.