Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Di Caro, John A, against A K A Amber Zeno Gentry, Amber R. Gentry Zeno A K A Amber Zeno Gentry, Amber Zeno Gentry Aka, Corporations Or Entities, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest Or Lien Upon Th, John Doe, Said Name Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Des, (total of 6) See All represented by Spina, Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Kathleen B. Hogan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathleen B. Hogan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 04, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 04, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 15, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2022 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
September 22, 2022 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
May 24, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
May 24, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY for JFS |
||
May 24, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for NOE for JFS |
||
May 24, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Notice of Sale |
||
April 13, 2022 |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #2) Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
February 26, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Military Status Affidavit |
||
February 26, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) Affidavit of Service by Mail |
||
February 26, 2022 |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #2) Proposed Expedited Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale on Vacant and Abandoned Property |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.