Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Jeff E Sanfilippo, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 01, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 01, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
March 18, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 16, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS | ||
March 16, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A client statement |
||
March 16, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION aff in support |
||
March 16, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
March 16, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT non-expiration of sol |
||
March 16, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION dod military search |
||
July 09, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFF OF MAILING/2ND NOTICE LETTER |
||
July 01, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.