Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Nbt Bank, National Association, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Levine, Louis, against Robert W Quinoes Jr, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Robert J Muller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert J Muller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 02, 2020JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: April 14, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 13, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: April 14, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: April 09, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: April 09, 2021SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: September 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 08, 2021ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT
Date: April 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 08, 2021ORDER - AWARDING FEE Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 08, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: April 08, 2021EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 02, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
April 14, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
April 14, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
April 14, 2021 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
April 13, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
April 13, 2021 |
ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1) Order Granting Attorneys' Fees |
||
April 09, 2021 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
April 09, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
April 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) B. Contract |
||
April 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) G. Affidavit of facts |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.