Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon Fka The Bank Of New York, As Trustee For The Certifi, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Komosinski, Richard F, Mckniff, Christopher Michael, against David H Torra, John Doe John Doe Number One Through John Doe Number Ten, John Doe Number One Through John Doe Number Ten, Maggie L Torra, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Kathleen B. Hogan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathleen B. Hogan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 18, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 13, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: February 18, 2020NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: February 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 13, 2020ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: June 09, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: June 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: February 18, 2020CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: February 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 13, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 13, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 13, 2020ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: February 17, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: July 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: February 18, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: February 18, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 13, 2020ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: October 20, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: December 18, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: February 17, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: October 20, 2020ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: October 20, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 13, 2020RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 20, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: March 24, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: July 28, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 08, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: November 04, 2021ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 08, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: September 23, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: September 23, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: April 21, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: April 22, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: October 20, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: April 22, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: November 04, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISCONTINUE
Date: February 08, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: March 24, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: December 18, 2020ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: April 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2022 |
ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #1) Order discontinuing action and canceling notice of pendency |
||
February 08, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
February 08, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
February 08, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 08, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISCONTINUE | ||
November 04, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 04, 2021 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
September 23, 2021 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
September 23, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 28, 2021 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.