Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Garbus, Mark A, Jordan, Tarah Eve, against Sarah Rozelle, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 14, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions298 days |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 04, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: December 11, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 14, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2020 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 11, 2020 | ADMINISTRATIVE REVIEW TRANSMITTAL SHEET : DEFAULT JUDGMENTS FOR CREDIT CARD DEBT | ||
December 08, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
December 08, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION NON MIL Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MIL Redacted |
||
December 08, 2020 |
AFFIRMATION DOD Redacted per 22 NYCRR DOD Redacted |
||
December 08, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR Redacted |
||
December 08, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted per 22 NYCRR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF Redacted |
||
December 08, 2020 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
March 10, 2020 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFF OF MAILING/2ND NOTICE LETTER |
||
March 04, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.