Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Burt Dwain Butler Sr Deceased By And Through, Jennifer Hauser As Administratix, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Lissauer, Lawrence D, against Fort Hudson Health System Inc, Fort Hudson Nursing Center Inc, represented by Shalhoub, Michael D, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Robert J Muller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert J Muller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Declaratory Judgment) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 31, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: July 09, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: August 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2020 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 07, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
July 31, 2020 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2) Statement of Auth |
||
July 31, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Opposition |
||
July 09, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) This is an updated version of the Affidavit. I fixed some typos. The exhibits are not included. |
||
July 09, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) Daniel J. Heim Affidavit (Defense) |
||
July 08, 2020 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
||
July 08, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) 2009 BILL TEXT A.B.725 AND ATTEMPTS |
||
July 08, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) DEFENDANTS' EXPERT DISCLOSURE |
||
July 08, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) A LETTER AND EMAILS REGARDING MOTION TO REARGUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.