Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Battenkill Country Club Inc., filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Williams Buettner, Karla Marie, against The Town Of Easton, Washington County, New York, Town Of Easton Assessor, Town Of Easton Board Of Assessment Review, represented by Phillips, Dennis John, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts with Martin D Auffredou presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMartin D Auffredou Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
Case Cycle Time522 days |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 04, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 03, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: May 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2020 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
December 20, 2019 | Hearing |
POST-SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL AUFFREDOU (Court Activity) Judge: HON. MARTIN D. AUFFREDOU |
|
September 06, 2019 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
May 16, 2019 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
April 04, 2019 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
April 04, 2019 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
April 01, 2019 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
March 27, 2019 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE FILED AUFFREDOU (Court Activity) Judge: HON. MARTIN D. AUFFREDOU |
|
March 27, 2019 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
July 24, 2018 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.