Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Di Caro, John A, Roth, Gerald C, against Avona Curry A K A Avona C. Curry, Avona Curry A K A Avona C. Curry, John Doe, Said Name Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants Of Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, And Any Parties, Corporations Or Entities, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises, John Doe, Said Name Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants Of Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, And Any Parties, Corporations Or Entities, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises, Wayne Curry A K A Wayne M. Curry, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts Washington County Supreme Court with Glen Bruening presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGlen Bruening Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions559 days |
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseWashington County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time616 days |
John Doe, Said Name Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants Of Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, And Any Parties, Corporations Or Entities, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises
ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 23, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: January 16, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2021 |
FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM fully executed Foreclosure Action Surplus Monies form |
||
October 19, 2021 |
REFEREE REPORT OF SALE fully executed Referee's Report of Sale |
||
August 31, 2021 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
July 27, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation to Schedule a Judicial Sale in Mortgage Foreclosure Action |
||
July 21, 2021 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney |
||
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY for JFS with AOS |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | |
February 21, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #004) BRUENING (Motion Part) Judge: HON. GLEN T. BRUENING |
|
February 21, 2020 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT BRUENING (Court Activity) Judge: HON. GLEN T. BRUENING |
|
February 14, 2020 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #004) BRUENING (Motion Part) Judge: HON. GLEN T. BRUENING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.