Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
In Re The Matter Of And Application For Court Approval Of The Sale And Transfer Of Certain Structured Settlement Payment Rights Of J And K Mills Pursuant To And In Accordance With Gen Oblig Law 5 1701 Et Seq, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Other (Sale/Transfer) case represented by Brandimarte, Luigi, against None, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, NY, . Washington County, NY Superior Courts Washington County Supreme Court with Martin D Auffredou presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMartin D Auffredou Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 20, 2018 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Other (Sale/Transfer) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2020 |
||
Filing LocationWashington County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseWashington County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time64 days |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)
Date: June 20, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)
Date: August 23, 2018RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Copy of Order |
|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) | |
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - FINAL (Motion #1) | |
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) | |
August 23, 2018 | Hearing |
PRE-MOTION AUFFREDOU (Court Activity) Judge: HON. MARTIN D. AUFFREDOU |
|
August 23, 2018 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) AUFFREDOU (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MARTIN D. AUFFREDOU |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | PETITION (AMENDED) | |
July 31, 2018 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) AUFFREDOU (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MARTIN D. AUFFREDOU |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.