Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Christopher M Mcbride, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Judd, Karen Lynn, against Andrea M Mcbride, represented by Place, Rose Theresa, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts with Paulette M. Kershko presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaulette M. Kershko Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
January 13, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
September 23, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
September 16, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 15, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
September 15, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
September 15, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
July 21, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
July 06, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
July 06, 2022 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.