Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Arcarius Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Frimet, Rhett Andre, against Alan Co Group Llc, George Alan Collins Ind, Jacqueline A Akers Ind, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 08, 2022BILL OF COSTS
Date: March 08, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: March 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 24, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: June 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 08, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
March 08, 2022 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
March 08, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
December 09, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 24, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 02, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.