Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Glens Falls Hospital, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Donovan, Linda L, against Michael L Granger, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts with Martin D Auffredou presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMartin D Auffredou Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 19, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 19, 2021EXECUTION
Date: April 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 13, 2022 | EXECUTION | ||
February 23, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 22, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
February 09, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
February 09, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
February 09, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 08, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
January 18, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
January 13, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 07, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.