Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Robert J Akley, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 10, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: December 10, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2022 | DEFECT CHECKLIST | ||
December 10, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT AOF |
||
December 10, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION SIGNED PJTAFF |
||
December 10, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENT |
||
December 10, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SIGNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
||
December 10, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION MILITARY |
||
December 10, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT SIGNED NON-SOL |
||
December 10, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
October 29, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
October 20, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.