Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Arcarius Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Frimet, Rhett Andre, against Robin Tracey Statz, R T Statz Custom Homes Inc, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 25, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 03, 2022 | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ACTION / PROCEEDING | ||
August 25, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 19, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 17, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 10, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.