Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Medline Industries Inc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Brown, Marc William, against Glens Falls City Of, Glens Falls City Of Assessor, Glens Falls City Of Board Of Assessment Review, represented by Williams Buettner, Karla Marie, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts with Robert J Muller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert J Muller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
PETITION
Date: July 21, 2021NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 21, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
April 27, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
April 27, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
April 27, 2023 | DECISION ON MOTION -SETTLE ORD / JGMT | ||
January 17, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
March 07, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
March 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #3) Correspondence |
||
March 03, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
February 28, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
February 28, 2022 |
CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) CERTIFICATION OF COMPLIANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.