Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
112 Ski Bowl Road Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Brown, Marc William, against Johnsburg Town Of, Johnsburg Town Of Assessor, Johnsburg Town Of Board Of Assessment Review, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts with Robert J Muller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert J Muller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
PETITION
Date: July 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 28, 2021PETITION (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID)
Date: July 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2023 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
March 02, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
February 27, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | ||
November 08, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 08, 2021 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
August 10, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
August 03, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service |
||
July 22, 2021 | PETITION (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID) | ||
July 21, 2021 | PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.