Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Christopher M Tate, David C Tate, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Browne, Erika C, against Bolton Town Of, Bolton Town Of Assessor, Bolton Town Of Board Of Assessment Review, in the jurisdiction of Warren County, NY, . Warren County, NY Superior Courts with Martin D Auffredou presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMartin D Auffredou Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationWarren County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
PETITION
Date: July 16, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 16, 2021NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 03, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 22, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2021INCOME VERIFICATION STATEMENT
Date: January 31, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 31, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2022 | INCOME VERIFICATION STATEMENT | ||
January 31, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 10, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
November 10, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 03, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Proof of Service upon County Treasurer and School District |
||
August 03, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Proof of Service upon Assessor |
||
July 22, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
July 16, 2021 | PETITION | ||
July 16, 2021 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION | ||
July 16, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Complaint on Real Property Assessment for 2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.